Ismail, Laila R M (CPSO#: 82309)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French, Italian

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bank Medical Center
Suite 1
1935 Bank street
Ottawa ON  K1V 8A3
Phone: (613)521-2391 Ext. 131
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAILA R M ISMAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISMAIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 11 Apr 2005 to 15 Apr 2005
PEAP - Resident - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 15 Nov 2010 to 14 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Apr 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2014