Ismail, Said Osman (CPSO#: 87986)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Apr 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Apr 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Somalian

Education:National University of Somalia, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 58726
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Said O. Ismail Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ismail ( CPSO# 87986 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
89 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4B8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 15 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAID OSMAN ISMAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISMAIL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jan 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2010