Ismail, Shiraz Hassanali (CPSO#: 27189)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jan 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jan 1975

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Kachchi, Urdu

Education:University College of East Africa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
12 Brandy Court
Toronto ON  M3B 3L3
Phone: (416) 469-0491
Fax: (416) 469-0773
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shiraz Ismail Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ismail ( CPSO# 27189 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHIRAZ HASSANALI ISMAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISMAIL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1975

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 17, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)