Ismaili, Arif (CPSO#: 74844)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Calgary, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
564 Belmont Ave. West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone: (519) 741-5786
Fax: (519) 741-0030
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arif Ismaili Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ismaili ( CPSO# 74844 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 741-5786

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 26 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARIF ISMAILI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISMAILI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004