Ismiil, Nadia Dawod (CPSO#: 73330)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Nov 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Nov 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, Assyrian, English

Education:UNIVERSITY OF BASRA, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 4278
Fax: (416) 480-4271
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nadia Ismiil Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ismiil ( CPSO# 73330 )

Business Address:
Sunnbrook Health Sciences Centre
Room E4-31
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4278

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 May 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADIA DAWOD ISMIIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISMIIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 1999 to 31 May 1999
Elective Trainee - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2002