Ispahany, Mohammad Mehdi (CPSO#: 89964)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 4
403 Arkell Road
Guelph ON  N1L 1E5
Phone: (519) 822-7831
Fax: (226) 299-0503
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

84 Carden Street
Guelph ON  N1H 3A3
Canada
Phone: (519) 837-6853
Fax: (519) 837-6853
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Unit 7
91 Queen Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 4M7
Canada
Phone: (519) 576-02
Fax: (519) 584-0223
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

1001 Ridgeway St E
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 5H8
Canada
Phone: (807) 333-0777
Fax: (855) 597-8500
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

183 1st Ave W
North Bay ON  P1B 3B8
Canada
Phone: (705) 223-3771
Fax: (855) 597-8500
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

615 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2R2
Canada
Phone: (289) 319-1030
Fax: (855) 597-8500
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Mehdi Ispahany Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ispahany ( CPSO# 89964 )

Business Address:
183 1st Avenue West
North Bay ON  N1L 1E5
Phone Number: (519) 822-7831

Business Address:
615 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2R2
Phone Number: (289) 319-1030

Business Address:
1001 Ridgeway Street East
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 5H8

Business Address:
84 Carden Street
Guelph ON  N1H 3A3

Business Address:
Unit 7
91 Queen Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 4M7

Business Address:
4-403 Arkell Medical Centre
Guelph ON  N1L 1E5
Phone Number: (519) 822-7831

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Lions Head Site Lions Head
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD MEHDI ISPAHANY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISPAHANY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2008 to 23 Jan 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Jan 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2009 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2010