Ivankovic, Maria Natalie (CPSO#: 79127)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
2200 Eglinton Ave. West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4530
Fax: (905) 813-4548
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: 416-530-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maria Ivankovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ivankovic ( CPSO# 79127 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Emergency Department
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4530

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (905) 813-4530

Business Address:
Canadian Place Endoscopy Clinic
1065 Canadian Place
Suite 122-123
Mississauga ON  L4W 0C2
Phone Number: (905) 813-4530

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 11 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA NATALIE IVANKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IVANKOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2005