Ivanov, Karolina (CPSO#: 91958)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Nov 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto, ON
M4K 2P8
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone: (416) 461-9471 Ext. 3610
Fax: (416) 461-2710
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAROLINA IVANOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IVANOV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Aug 2009 to 26 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 12 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 13 Jul 2010 to 26 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Jul 2010 to 17 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 18 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2013