Ivers, Noah Michael (CPSO#: 86533)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Family Practice Health Centre
77 Grenville Street
4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B3
Phone: (416) 323-6060
Fax: (416) 323-6255
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ivers And Halperin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ivers ( CPSO# 86533 )
Dr. I. Halperin ( CPSO# 86531 )

Business Address:
77 Grenville Street
4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B3
Phone Number: (416) 323-6060

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room H121
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6056

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NOAH MICHAEL IVERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IVERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009