Iyengar, Abhinav Mohan (CPSO#: 91265)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 308
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 725-9374
Fax: (613) 725-9195
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queensway-Carelton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 721-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

The Ottawa Hospital -General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M2
Canada
Phone: 6137985555
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abhinav Iyengar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Iyengar ( CPSO# 91265 )

Business Address:
308 - 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 725-9374

Business Address:
Queensway-Carelton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M2
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 30 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABHINAV MOHAN IYENGAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IYENGAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2013