Iyer, Hariharan Subramaniam (CPSO#: 89266)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Pramukhswami Medical College, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Department of Medicine
Room A10 - 207
339 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3852 Ext. 33285
Fax: (519) 663-3449
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Iyer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Iyer ( CPSO# 89266 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Hospital
Department of Medicine
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 18 Oct 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 29 Jul 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Hariharan Subramaniam Iyer may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of   Nephrology,  University of Western Ontario, in which
                        Dr. Iyer holds an academic appointment  at  the  rank  of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr.  Iyer  no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.