Iyer, Lakshmi Priya (CPSO#: 82479)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Apr 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Telugu

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
13291 Yonge St
Suite 300
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone: (905)773-7843
Fax: (905)773-9614
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit LF 10
1849 Yonge St
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Canada
Phone: 416-920-3737
Fax: 416-920-7848
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shetty Iyer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Shetty ( CPSO# 82981 )
Dr. L. Iyer ( CPSO# 82479 )

Business Address:
Suite 300
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-7843

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
LF 20 - 1849 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone Number: (416) 920-3737

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 28 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAKSHMI PRIYA IYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IYER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2010