Iyer, Rama Padmanabhan (CPSO#: 62931)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil

Education:Banaras Hindu University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
596 McNaughton Ave W
Chatham ON  N7L 4J6
Phone: (519) 351-0111
Fax: (519) 351-0112
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Iyer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Iyer ( CPSO# 62931 )

Business Address:
Dynacare Heart Health Services
801 - 2001 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 4Z8
Phone Number: (877) 718-2196

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 22 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAMA PADMANABHAN IYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IYER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1991