Iyer, Vikram Sekar (CPSO#: 83797)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44159
Fax: (905) 521-0440
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Iyer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Iyer ( CPSO# 83797 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 06 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIKRAM SEKAR IYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IYER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 24 Oct 2005 to 18 Dec 2005
Elective Trainee - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2009