Davis, Janet Lynne (CPSO#: 71081)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jan 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Nephrology
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400
Fax: (613) 738-8337
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McKillop Davis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Davis ( CPSO# 71081 )
Dr. G. McKillop ( CPSO# 68802 )

Business Address:
95 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 256-2567

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
Department of Nephrology
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 05 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANET LYNNE DAVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jun 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2000 to 28 Oct 2000
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Oct 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2002