Falletta, Joseph Samuel Anthony (CPSO#: 20791)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 1967

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Mar 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph S. Falletta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Falletta ( CPSO# 20791 )

Business Address:
531 Queenston Road
Hamilton ON  L8K 1J7
Phone Number: (905) 560-5680

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1967
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 03 Mar 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 03 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 03 Nov 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 10 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 06 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 11 Oct 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 11 Oct 2017 Active View Details [+]

            (1 of 3)
            As from April 6, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Joseph Samuel Anthony
            Falletta in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Falletta to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Falletta has ceased practising medicine until such time as he has
                  obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.
                  
            (2 of 3)
            As from October 11, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Joseph Samuel Anthony
            Falletta in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Falletta to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking") of
                                      DR. JOSEPH SAMUEL FALLETTA
                                          ("Dr. Falletta") to
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the
                  Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Falletta, certificate of registration number 20791, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Falletta, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 404608(the "Investigation") into whether I engaged in
                  professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my boxing medicine
                  practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Falletta, acknowledge that, if an original copy of this
                  Undertaking as signed by me is accepted by the Inquiries, Complaints and
                  Reports Committee, the College will also deliver a caution in person.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Falletta, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the
                  ICR Committee ("Effective Date").

             (6)  Professional Education

                  (a)   I, Dr. Falletta, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all of the following professional education (the
                        "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   individualized coaching in medical professionalism
                              satisfactory to the College, with an instructor approved by
                              the College
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Falletta, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Falletta, undertake to complete this requirement within six
                        (6) months of the date of this undertaking.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Falletta, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Falletta, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (9)   I, Dr. Falletta, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (10)  I, Dr. Falletta, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (11)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Falletta, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Falletta, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (11)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr.
                              Falletta engaged in professional misconduct and/or is
                              incompetent in his boxing medicine practice. As a result of
                              the investigation:
                  
                                    Dr. Falletta will engage in individualized education in
                                    professionalism.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Falletta, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to any person who requires this information for
                  the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (13)  I, Dr. Falletta, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who
                  facilitate my completion of the Professional Education to disclose to the
                  College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking;
                         and/or
                  
                   (c)  which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  
                  
            (3 of 3)
            As from October 3, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Joseph Samuel Anthony
            Falletta in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Falletta to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                  DR. JOSEPH SAMUEL ANTHONY FALLETTA
                                           ("Dr. Falletta")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Falletta, certificate of registration number 20791, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Falletta, acknowledge that this undertaking replaces my March 3,
                  2016 undertaking with the College.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Falletta, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this
                  Undertaking from the date on which I sign it.


            (5)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Falletta, undertake that, effective immediately, I will
                        restrict my practice to conducting annual physical examinations of
                        boxers.
                  
            (6)   Resignation of Prescribing Privileges   

                  (a)   I, Dr. Falletta, acknowledge that I have executed the Prescribing
                        Resignation Letter to Health Canada, which is attached hereto as
                        Schedule "A" (the "Resignation Letter").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Falletta, consent to the College sending the Resignation
                        Letter to Health Canada on my behalf.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Falletta, undertake and agree that I will not issue new
                        prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any of the
                        following substances:
                  
                        (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                              19);
                        (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                        (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                              Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c.
                              F-27); 
                        (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19); 
                              (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                              Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached
                              hereto as Schedule "B"; and the current regulatory lists are
                              attached hereto as Schedule "C")
                        (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics
                              Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in
                              Schedule "D");
                              and as amended from time to time.
                  
            (7)   I, Dr. Falletta, undertake that I will return any supplies of the
                  substances referred to in section (6)(c) above that are presently in my
                  possession, in any place, to a pharmacy in a safe and secure manner, as
                  stipulated in the College's Policy Number 8-12, "Prescribing Drugs."

            (8)   Dr. Falletta must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all
                  his Office Practice Locations, attached hereto as Schedule "E" which
                  states as follows: 

                                          IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
                        Dr. Joseph Samuel Anthony Falletta has agreed not to prescribe any
                        of the following: 
                        -Narcotic Drugs
                        -Narcotic Preparations
                        -Controlled Drugs
                        -Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                        -All other Monitored Drugs
                  
                        Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and
                        Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
                  
            (9)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Falletta, undertake to practice under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)") .
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Falletta, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Schedule "F", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Schedule
                              "G";
                  
                        (ii)  Within four months of the date of this undertaking, review my
                              charts from a minimum of 5 annual physical examinations of a
                              boxer;
                  
                        (iii) Within two months of the date of this undertaking, facilitate
                              my direct observation of his or her sports medicine practice
                              for a minimum of four half days;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vii) Provide a report to the College after the completion of
                              8b(ii) and (iii)
                              or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has concerns
                              about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Falletta, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP set out at Schedule "G" to my
                        Undertaking, and concerns that may arise during the period of
                        Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Falletta, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Schedule "F" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Falletta, undertake to ensure that Schedule "F" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Falletta, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Schedule "F" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Falletta, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (9)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practicing medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Falletta agree that if I am required to cease practice as a
                        result of section (9)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (10)  Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Falletta, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete the following professional education:
                  
                        (i)   all aspects of the detailed IEP (Schedule G); and
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Falletta, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the professional education set out in
                        section (10)(a) within one (1) month of completing it.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Falletta, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the professional education set out in section (10)(a).
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Falletta, undertake to complete this requirement within four
                        months or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by
                        the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
            (11)  Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Falletta, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (9)
                        above and Schedule "F" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of
                        my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors
                        selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and
                        agree that the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct
                        observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers,
                        feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the
                        College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Falletta, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking and to
                        abide by those recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved
                        by the ICR Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Falletta, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) may receive and review the findings of the
                        Assessor(s), and may discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or
                        concerns arising from the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that
                        the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported
                        to the College and the report may form the basis of further action
                        by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Falletta, understand and agree that if I am of the view that
                        any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will
                        have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations
                        within which to provide the College with my submissions in this
                        regard.  I further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR
                        Committee will consider my submissions and make a determination
                        regarding whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are
                        reasonable and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute
                        limitations or restrictions on my practice, and that decision will
                        be provided to me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Falletta, undertake that, following the decision referenced
                        in section (11)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of
                        the Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are
                        reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Falletta, hereby consent to any of the following being
                        included on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations
                        on my certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23
                        of the Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                              conditions or limitations on my practice;  
                  
                        (ii)  any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (11)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (12)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Falletta, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Falletta, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Falletta, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and NMS, and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Falletta, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Schedule "H" and Schedule "I". 
                  
            (13)  I, Dr. Falletta, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and
                  acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may
                  constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may
                  result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee
                  of the College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Falletta, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (15)  I, Dr. Falletta, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for
                  payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (16)  I, Dr. Falletta, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (17)  I, Dr. Falletta, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this
                  Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
                  available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
                  remains in effect.

            (18)  I, Dr. Falletta, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on
                  the College's Register that is available to the public during the time
                  period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Falletta has voluntarily restricted his practice to conducting
                        annual physical examinations of boxers.
                  
                        Dr. Falletta will practice under the guidance of a Clinical
                        Supervisor acceptable to the College. 
                  
                        Dr. Falletta's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected
                        by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical
                        Supervision.
                  
                        Dr. Falletta must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing
                        prescriptions for any of the following substances:
                  
                  (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
                        the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                        under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
                        under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27); 
                  (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                        Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made
                        under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
                  (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);   and as amended from
                        time to time.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (19)  I, Dr. Falletta, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to any person who requires this information for
                  the purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education
                  set out in section (10) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (20)  I, Dr. Falletta, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (21)  I, Dr. Falletta, give my irrevocable consent to any person who
                  facilitates my completion of the professional education set out in
                  section (10) above, and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and
                  Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Schedule F;
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section (10) above and which he
                        or she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 11, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Joseph Samuel Falletta to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 11, 2017:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Falletta engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his boxing medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Falletta will engage in individualized education in professionalism.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 11, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: Member
Active Date: October 3, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Joseph Samuel Anthony Falletta to the College of Physicians and Surgeons, effective October 3, 2016:
Dr. Falletta has voluntarily restricted his practice to conducting annual physical examinations of boxers.

Dr. Falletta will practice under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.

Dr. Falletta’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.

Dr. Falletta must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any of the following substances:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);
(iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(v) All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22); and as amended from time to time.