Habot, Juda (CPSO#: 65575)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Sep 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Yiddish

Education:University of Calgary, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Codsell Avenue,
Lower Level
North York ON  M3H 3V6
Phone: (647) 699-9800
Fax: (647) 699-9808
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 602
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Canada
Phone: 1-888-662-0680
Fax: 905-953-0046
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Southlake Regional
Healthcare Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 885-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Juda Habot Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Habot ( CPSO# 65575 )
Dr. J. Todd ( CPSO# 65604 )

Business Address:
Suite 602
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 953-0046

Business Address:
Codsell Medical
1 Codsell Avenue
Lower Level
Toronto ON  M3H 3Y6
Phone Number: (647) 699-9800

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Healthcare Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 885-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 13 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUDA HABOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABOT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Aug 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2002