First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 2001 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Dec 2001 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 14 Mar 2002 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Mar 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Mar 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Mar 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Sep 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Mar 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Apr 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Mar 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Apr 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |