Rubabaza, Jean-Placide A (CPSO#: 82500)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Swahili

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3100 Brock Street North
Suite 7
Whitby ON  L1R 3J7
Phone: (905) 665-3100
Fax: (905) 665-3120
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rubabaza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rubabaza ( CPSO# 82500 )

Business Address:
Suite 7
3100 Brock Street North
Whitby ON  L1R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 665-3100


Corporation Name: Eltayeb and Rubabaza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Eltayeb ( CPSO# 68059 )
Dr. J. Rubabaza ( CPSO# 82500 )

Business Address:
3100 Brock Street
Suite 7
Whitby ON  L1R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 665-3100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 25 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEAN-PLACIDE A RUBABAZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUBABAZA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2011