Jaber, Zaid Mohammed Ali (CPSO#: 92141)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Al-Nahrain University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: 5197423611
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Blvd East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Canada
Phone: (905) 632-3737
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Benton Medical Clinic
51 Benton Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 3H1
Canada
Phone: 226-240-3014
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

St Mary Hospital
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zaid Jaber Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Jaber ( CPSO# 92141 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 742-3611

Business Address:
St Mary Hospital
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
51 Benton Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 3H1
Phone Number: (226) 240-3014

Business Address:
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Iraq
New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 12 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZAID MOHAMMED ALI JABER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JABER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2009