Jacka, Robert Michael (CPSO#: 78533)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Feb 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit B
370 Burnham Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 1T6
Phone: (705) 740-0066
Fax: (705) 740-0046
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. M. Jacka Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Jacka ( CPSO# 78533 )

Business Address:
370B Burnham Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 1T6
Phone Number: (705) 740-0066

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT MICHAEL JACKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACKA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2002
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Nov 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2004