Jackson, Reuben (CPSO#: 75284)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of New South Wales, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2003