Jackson, Zane Steven (CPSO#: 82934)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 715
115 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4B8
Phone: (416) 741-8998
Fax: (416) 741-8993
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zane Jackson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Jackson ( CPSO# 82934 )

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital
William Osler Health Centre
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Business Address:
715 - 115 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 741-8998

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZANE STEVEN JACKSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACKSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009