Jacob, Abraham John (CPSO#: 89257)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Corktown Medical Centre
Unit 1
589 King Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 1M6
Phone: (416) 419-4462
Fax: (416) 419-7283
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abraham Jacob Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jacob ( CPSO# 89257 )

Business Address:
Unit 1
589 King Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 1M6
Phone Number: (416) 419-4462

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABRAHAM JOHN JACOB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACOB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2010