Jacob, George Puthenfurayil (CPSO#: 92899)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
65 Thames Street
Chatham ON  N7L 1S4
Phone: (519) 397-5628
Fax: (519) 397-1314
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George P. Jacob Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Jacob ( CPSO# 92899 )

Business Address:
65 Thames Street
Chatham ON  N7L 1S4
Phone Number: (519) 397-5628

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE PUTHENFURAYIL JACOB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACOB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2015