Jacob, John Roshan (CPSO#: 94720)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2011 to 24 Mar 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 25 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Apr 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 May 2013 to 31 Oct 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2013