Jacob, Sanjay Michael (CPSO#: 79084)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CVT Associates
Regina General Hospital
Medical Office Wing
1440 - 14th Avenue
Regina SK  S4P 0W5
Phone: (306) 766-6900
Fax: (306) 766-6920

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 17 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANJAY MICHAEL JACOB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACOB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008