Jacobson, Michelle Rebecca (CPSO#: 90502)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville St
5th floor Gynaecology
Toronto ON  M5S1B2
Phone: 4163237744
Fax: 4163236237
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

700 University Ave, 3-320
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Canada
Phone: 4165864800 Ext. 2739
Fax: 4165863101
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle Jacobson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jacobson ( CPSO# 90502 )

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
5th Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-7744

Business Address:
8th Floor
712-700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE REBECCA JACOBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACOBSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2014