Jacoby, Lynn Marie (CPSO#: 95520)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Michigan, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Appletree Medical Group 104-1902 Robertson Rd Ottawa ON K2H 5B8
Date Received: 31 Jul 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Dec 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Dec 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2017