Jacques, Cindi Nicole (CPSO#: 90072)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 21 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2008 to 15 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2009 to 15 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Transfusion Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 01 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Transfusion Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2014