Jada, Naim George (CPSO#: 95557)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Apr 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Apr 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 21 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAIM GEORGE JADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JADA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 22 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 21 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 22 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 21 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2018