Jafari, Katayoon (CPSO#: 91551)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 May 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 May 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 09 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATAYOON JAFARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAFARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 23 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 09 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 10 Dec 2011 to 09 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 10 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Apr 2015
Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2018