Jaffer, Iqbal Haider (CPSO#: 95481)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Oct 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Oct 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
H H S Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Cardiac Surgery
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sabira S. Kanani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kanani ( CPSO# 95311 )
Dr. I. Jaffer ( CPSO# 95481 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
Jurvavinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018 Active View Details [+]
            Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (1)   Dr.  Iqbal  Haider  Jaffer  shall  practise  medicine  as required by the
                  postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. Jaffer is enrolled at
                  McMaster University.

            (2)   In  Dr. Jaffer's practice in the postgraduate medical education  program,
                  Dr. Jaffer  shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of
                  a clinical teaching  unit that is formally affiliated with the department
                  where  Dr.  Jaffer  is  properly   practising   medicine   and  to  which
                  postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of
                  its program of postgraduate medical education.

            (3)   In  Dr. Jaffer's practice in the postgraduate medical education  program,
                  Dr. Jaffer shall not charge a fee for medical services.

            Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (4)   Dr. Jaffer  may  practise  medicine in the intensive care unit and to the
                  extent of his employment at  Hamilton  Health Sciences Corporation, while
                  under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.
                  
            (5)   In Dr. Jaffer's practice specified in paragraph  (4),  Dr. Jaffer may not
                  charge a fee for medical services.

            Expiry of Certificate

            (6)   This certificate of registration expires, and Dr.  Jaffer  must thereupon
                  cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education
                  program, on the earlier of the following times:

                  (a)   when Dr. Jaffer is no longer enrolled in a program of  postgraduate
                        medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or
                  
                  (b)   when  Dr.  Jaffer  no  longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent
                        resident  status, or a valid  employment  authorization  under  the
                        Immigration Act (Canada).
                  
            Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (7)   This  certificate   automatically  converts  to  a  regular  Postgraduate
                  Education certificate and Dr.  Jaffer must immediately cease all practice
                  outside the postgraduate  medical  education  program  if  any one of the
                  following occurs:

                  (a)   the supervisor identified in paragraph (4) notifies the  College of
                        any  concerns  regarding  Dr. Jaffer's practice, including but  not
                        limited  to  concerns  regarding   knowledge,  skill,  judgment  or
                        attitude;
                  
                  (b)   the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Jaffer's practice;
                  
                  (c)   the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school's
                        approval  for  Dr.   Jaffer  to  engage  in  practice  outside  the
                        postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;
                  
                  (d)   when Dr. Jaffer's employment as specified  in paragraph (4) ceases;
                        or
                  
                  (e)   if  Dr.  Jaffer takes a leave of absence, or transfers  to  another
                        program, from  the  postgraduate  education  program  specified  in
                        paragraph (1).
                  
            Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (8)   In   the   event  of  conversion  to  a  regular  Postgraduate  Education
                  certificate  under  paragraph  (7)  or  expiry  of  the certificate under
                  paragraph  (7),  Dr.  Jaffer  may  not  resume any practice  outside  the
                  postgraduate medical education program under  the restricted registration
                  for residents policy until Dr. Jaffer applies for  a  new  certificate of
                  registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.



            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  October  2, 2013.  In accordance  with
                  paragraph  6(a), this certificate of registration  expires  on  June  30,
                  2019.  All practice must cease on that date.

                  Practice  outside   the   postgraduate  medical  education  program  must
                  immediately cease upon any of the events in paragraph 7.