Jahagirdar, Anusha (CPSO#: 96263)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2446 Bank Street, Suite 201
Ottawa ON
K1V 1A4
Ottawa ON  K1V 1A4
Phone: 613-739-0998
Fax: 613-739-1485
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2865 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1V 8N5
Canada
Phone: 613-731-4660
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anusha Jahagirdar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 06 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jahagirdar ( CPSO# 96263 )

Business Address:
Towngate Family Medicine - FHO
Suite 201
2446 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 1A4
Phone Number: (613) 739-0998

Business Address:
2865 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1V 8N5
Phone Number: (613) 731-4660

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANUSHA JAHAGIRDAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAHAGIRDAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2013