Jain, Amish Kishen Behari (CPSO#: 89944)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Sep 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Nagpur University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Div Neonatal Perinatal Medicine
Department of Paediatrics
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 02 Aug 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective: 02 Aug 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Oct 2008 to 18 Dec 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 Dec 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Sep 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Amish Kishen Behari Jain may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  Division  of   Neonatology, University of Toronto, in
                        which  Dr.  Jain  holds an academic  appointment  at  the  rank  of
                        Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  when Dr. Jain no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.