Jain, Arsh Kumar (CPSO#: 77937)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jan 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Campus Site
Department of Nephrology
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8561
Fax: (519) 685-8028
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Jain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jain ( CPSO# 77937 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Campus Site
Division of Nephrology
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 19 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARSH KUMAR JAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2007