Jain, Michael David (CPSO#: 91283)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Moffitt Cancer Center
FOB-3 BMT PROG
12902 USF Magnolia Drive
Tampa FL  33612
United States
Phone: (813) 745-4673

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 07 Nov 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL DAVID JAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2013