Jain, Preeti (CPSO#: 73192)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Rajasthan University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 306
726 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6G 4A1
Phone: (416) 534-1159
Fax: (416) 572-0083
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5133
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Preeti Jain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Jain ( CPSO# 73192 )

Business Address:
306 - 726 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6G 4A1
Phone Number: (416) 534-1159

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PREETI JAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 31 Jan 1999
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2000