Jain, Shauna Ashok (CPSO#: 74538)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: Kotecha, Shauna Ashok (used until: 11 Aug 2003 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Mississauga Medical
3050 Argentia Rd
Mississauga, Ontario
L5N8E1
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: 905-785-3627
Fax: 905-785-3628
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hospital for Sick Children, ER dept
555 University Ave
Toronto, Ontario
M5G1X8
Mississauga ON  L5N 8E1
Canada
Phone: 416-813-5807
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

2951 Walker's Line, main floor
Wharton Medical clinic
Mississauga ON  L7M 4Y1
Canada
Phone: 905 592-2301
Fax: 905 592-2302
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shauna Jain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 8 2011

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAUNA ASHOK JAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2000 to 31 Mar 2000
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2003