Jairath, Ashish (CPSO#: 96142)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jan 2019

Expiry Date:  17 Oct 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Jan 2019

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greater Niagara Medical Imaging
Independent Health Facilities
464 Welland Ave
St Catharines ON  L2M 5V4
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Merivale Medical Imaging
1370 Clyde Ave
Nepean ON  K2G 3H8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ashok Jairath Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jairath ( CPSO# 96142 )
Dr. A. Jairath ( CPSO# 54843 )

Business Address:
104 - 2100 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2Z9
Phone Number: (416) 739-7664

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2019
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 17 Oct 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jan 2019 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Ashish  Jairath  may  practise diagnostic radiology at the following
                  locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable
                  to the College:

                  (i)   Greater Niagara Medical Imaging Independent Health Facilities in St
                        Catharines,  Niagara  Falls,   Stratford,  Hamilton,  Toronto,  and
                        Welland, Ontario and;
                  
                  (ii)  Merivale Medical Imaging in Ottawa, Ontario.
                  
            2.    The  certificate of registration automatically  expires  on  October  17,
                  2019.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor  notifies  the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Jairath's knowledge, skill,  judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to the College  by  the  due  date  or  if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue to
                        supervise Dr. Jairath's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is issued on November 2, 2018, and will expire  on  or
                  before October 17, 2019, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.