Jakubow, Andre Nicholas (CPSO#: 94221)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win
Health Centre
1 Meno Ya Win Way
P O Box 909 Stn Main
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B4
Phone: (807) 737-3030
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CAMPBELLFORD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
146 OLIVER RD
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Canada
Phone: 705-643-1140
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

Hawkesbury and District Hospital
1111 Ghislain St
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Canada
Phone: (613) 632-1111
County: County of Prescott and Russell
Electoral District: 07

204-99 Kakulu Rd
Kanata ON  K2L 3C8
Canada
Phone: (613) 592-1269
Fax: (613) 592-1141
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Perth & Smiths Falls District Hosp
Great War Memorial - Perth Site
33 DRUMMOND ST W
Perth ON  K7H2K1
Canada
Phone: 6132671500
Fax: 6132640365
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

Perth & Smiths Falls District Hosp
Smiths Falls Site
60 CORNELIA ST W
Smiths Falls ON  K7A2H9
Canada
Phone: 6132832330
Fax: 6132838990
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

Kirkland & District Hospital
145 GOVERNMENT RD E
PO BOX 3000 STN MAIN
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3P4
Canada
Phone: 7055675251
Fax: 7055682102
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08

Temiskaming Hospital
421 SHEPHERDSON RD
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Canada
Phone: 7056471088
Fax: 7056475800
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08

Kirkland Dist. Family Health Team
PO BOX 10 STN MAIN
2 Water Lane
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3M6
Canada
Phone: (705) 567-2224
Fax: (705) 567-4250
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andre N. Jakubow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jakubow ( CPSO# 94221 )

Business Address:
204 - 99 Kakulu Road
Kanata ON  K2L 3C8

Business Address:
Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win Health Centre
1 Meno Ya Win Way
PO Box 909 Stn Main
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B4
Phone Number: (807) 737-3030

Business Address:
Hawkesbury and District Hospital
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Phone Number: (613) 632-1111

Business Address:
Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0

Business Address:
Temiskaming Hospital
421 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Phone Number: (705) 647-8121

Business Address:
Hugh Allen Clinic
79 Fifth Avenue North
Sioux Lookout ON  P0T 1K9
Phone Number: (807) 737-3803

Business Address:
Kirkland District Hospital
145 Government Road East
PO Box 3000, Stn Main
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3P4
Phone Number: (705) 567-5251

Business Address:
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Phone Number: (613) 283-2330

Business Address:
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2K1
Phone Number: (613) 267-1500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Sep 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDRE NICHOLAS JAKUBOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAKUBOW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2011