Jalal, Adnan Bin (CPSO#: 89364)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Hospital
Department Of Anesthesia
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adnan Jalal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 13 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jalal ( CPSO# 89364 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
268 Grosvenor Road
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 23 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADNAN BIN JALAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JALAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2014