Jalal, Elham Mohammed Mohammed Saeed (CPSO#: 93864)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 24 Sep 2013
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2014 to 09 Mar 2015
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 10 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015