Jamal, Hafeez Liaquatali (CPSO#: 79508)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Oct 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Kachchi, Spanish, Urdu

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 4617
4619 Burgoyne Street
Mississauga ON  L4W 1G3
Phone: (905) 614-0057
Fax: (905) 614-1688
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAFEEZ LIAQUATALI JAMAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2005