Jamal, Zeeya (CPSO#: 89610)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
suite 102, 8920 woodbine ave
Markham ON  L3R 9W9
Phone: (905) 305-9484
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4 campbell drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P1S4
Canada
Phone: 9058529771
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZEEYA JAMAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 09 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Jul 2009 to 09 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2015 to 04 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2011