James, Adrian Lewis (CPSO#: 75783)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Mar 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Mar 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Oxford University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Otolaryngology
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Ave Rm 6103
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6767
Fax: (416) 813-5036
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adrian James Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. James ( CPSO# 75783 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Otolaryngology
Room 6103
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-4938

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 11 Mar 2005 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Dec 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Feb 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 15 Feb 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 10 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 10 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Adrian Lewis James may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  clinical  teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                        Department of Otolaryngology,  University  of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        James   holds  a  geographical  full-time  teaching   or   research
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  to the extent  required by the teaching or research requirements of
                        his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate will automatically  expire when Dr. James no longer holds
                  the appointment, referred to in clause 1.