James, David Michael (CPSO#: 55701)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone: 905-378-4647 Ext. 33250
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dalgleish Jayawardene & Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2018


Corporation Name: Van Sittert Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 5 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Nebraska
USA - New York
USA - North Carolina

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID MICHAEL JAMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1986