James, Elizabeth Dawn Fiona (CPSO#: 83085)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2399 Parkedale Avenue
P.O. Box 50003
Brockville ON  K6V 7M7
Phone: (613) 900-8114
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH DAWN FIONA JAMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 2016