James, Paula Denise (CPSO#: 72135)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen's University
Room 2015 Etherington Hall
94 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone: (613) 533-6329
Fax: (613) 533-6855
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Engen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. James ( CPSO# 72135 )
Dr. D. Engen ( CPSO# 73829 )

Business Address:
Queen's University
Room 2025 Etherington Hall
Division of Hematology
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2946

Business Address:
Department of Anesthesiology and
Perioperative Medicine
Kingston General Hospital
Victory 2 76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 25 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAULA DENISE JAMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 04 May 1998 to 29 May 1998
Elective Trainee - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 May 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2000