Jamjoom, Khalid Farouk (CPSO#: 72091)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 02 Dec 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 12 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 1997 to 30 Sep 1998
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 1998 to 31 Jan 1999
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Dec 1998